open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:18-21686-
    Party Name:Richard Clark
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shearer, Robert [Final Decree]
    Date Published:August 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shearer, Robert [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:August 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shearer, Robert [BNC Certificate of Mailing-bk]
    Date Published:August 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shearer, Robert [Discharging Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shearer, Robert [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:June 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shearer, Robert [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 Closed for No Asset Cases]
    Date Published:June 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shearer, Robert [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:May 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shearer, Robert [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:May 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shearer, Robert [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset Individual]
    Date Published:May 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shearer, Robert [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:May 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shearer, Robert [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:May 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shearer, Robert [Notice of Review of Bankruptcy Petition]
    Date Published:May 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shearer, Robert [none]
    Date Published:April 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:April 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7]
    Date Published:April 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Notice Regarding Filing of Mailing Matrix - Local Bankruptcy Form 29]
    Date Published:April 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:April 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:April 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Ch 13 UST Form 13-FR-S -batch-]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?317941
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =