open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:18-24857-
    Party Name:Barbara Jean Fellows
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Declaration Re: Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Close Adversary Case]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Disposition of Adversary]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Conference Held]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Update Plan, Amended Plan, Disclosure Statement, or Objection to Disclosure Statement Deadlines]
    Date Published:April 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Certificate of No Objection]
    Date Published:April 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Certificate of Service - PAWB Form 7]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Hearing on Amended Plan]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan - PAWB Form 10]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Hearing on a Judge Taddonio Case Set by Attorney or Trustee]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Avoid Lien]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Complaint]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan and Setting Deadlines]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13 Held and Concluded]
    Date Published:February 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:January 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:December 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:December 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:December 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13 & 12]
    Date Published:December 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:December 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing-bk]
    Date Published:December 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice of Review of Bankruptcy Petition]
    Date Published:December 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:December 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
    Date Published:December 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Chapter 13 Plan - PAWB Form 10]
    Date Published:December 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan - PAWB Form 10]
    Date Published:December 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [none]
    Date Published:December 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [none]
    Date Published:December 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice Regarding Filing of Mailing Matrix - Local Bankruptcy Form 29]
    Date Published:December 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:December 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Notice Regarding Filing of Mailing Matrix - Local Bankruptcy Form 29]
    Date Published:December 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:December 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13]
    Date Published:December 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13]
    Date Published:December 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Change of Address]
    Date Published:November 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Ch 13 UST Form 13-FR-S -batch-]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?305945
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =