open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:16-10734-
    Party Name:Michael J. Stephanic, III and Amy L. Stephanic
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Transfer of Claim]
    Date Published:April 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Hearing on Amended Plan]
    Date Published:November 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan - PAWB Form 10]
    Date Published:November 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Order -Non-motion related-]
    Date Published:August 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Withdrawal -for court use-]
    Date Published:August 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
    Date Published:July 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Update Plan, Amended Plan, Disclosure Statement, or Objection to Disclosure Statement Deadlines]
    Date Published:December 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13 Held and Concluded]
    Date Published:November 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan and Setting Deadlines]
    Date Published:October 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:September 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:September 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Attach Wages]
    Date Published:August 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13 & 12]
    Date Published:August 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:August 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Corrective Entry]
    Date Published:August 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Chapter 13 Plan - PAWB Form 10]
    Date Published:August 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Petition Completed]
    Date Published:August 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:August 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Certificate of No Objection]
    Date Published:August 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:August 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Chapter 13 Trustees Report of Receipts and Disbursements]
    Date Published:August 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Certificate of Service - PAWB Form 7]
    Date Published:August 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:August 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Hearing w/o Forms]
    Date Published:August 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Request for Hearing]
    Date Published:August 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Extend Automatic Stay]
    Date Published:August 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [none]
    Date Published:August 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice of Review of Bankruptcy Petition]
    Date Published:August 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice Regarding Filing of Mailing Matrix - Local Bankruptcy Form 29]
    Date Published:August 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Notice Regarding Filing of Mailing Matrix - Local Bankruptcy Form 29]
    Date Published:August 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13]
    Date Published:August 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13]
    Date Published:August 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Dismissing Case or Debtor]
    Date Published:July 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Certificate of Service for Notice of Mortgage Payment Change or Post-Petition Fees]
    Date Published:May 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Directing Debtors To File a Notarized Affidavit]
    Date Published:May 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Certificate of Default Dismissal -batch-]
    Date Published:May 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Declaration Re: Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:December 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing-bk]
    Date Published:December 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:December 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Fixing Deadline to Deny a Motion]
    Date Published:August 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Attach Wages - PAWB Form 11]
    Date Published:August 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Conference Held]
    Date Published:August 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Extend Time to Complete the Bankruptcy Filing]
    Date Published:November 18, 2014
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Ch 13 UST Form 13-FR-S -batch-]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?307328
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =