open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:15-20938-
    Party Name:Patricia McGowan
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bononi, Eric E. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:April 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bononi, Eric E. [Final Decree]
    Date Published:April 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bononi, Eric E. [Receipt of Funds for Registry Account]
    Date Published:April 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bononi, Eric E. [Ch 13 UST Form 13-FR-S]
    Date Published:April 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bononi, Eric E. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:March 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bononi, Eric E. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:February 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bononi, Eric E. [Certificate of No Objection]
    Date Published:January 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bononi, Eric E. [Amended Schedule - Judge Bohm]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bononi, Eric E. [Amended Document]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bononi, Eric E. [Certificate of Service - PAWB Form 7]
    Date Published:January 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bononi, Eric E. [Hearing on a Judge Bohm Case Set by Attorney or Trustee]
    Date Published:January 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bononi, Eric E. [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:January 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bononi, Eric E. [Corrective Entry]
    Date Published:January 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bononi, Eric E. [Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:January 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bononi, Eric E. [1019 Conversion Report]
    Date Published:January 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bononi, Eric E. [none]
    Date Published:January 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bononi, Eric E. [Amended Schedules D E F]
    Date Published:January 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bononi, Eric E. [Notice Regarding Modification to Mailing Matrix - Local Bankruptcy Form 30]
    Date Published:January 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bononi, Eric E. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:January 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bononi, Eric E. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:December 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bononi, Eric E. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 Closed for No Asset Cases -multi-]
    Date Published:December 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bononi, Eric E. [Extend Time]
    Date Published:December 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bononi, Eric E. [Ch 13 UST Form 13-FR-S -batch-]
    Date Published:November 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bononi, Eric E. [Chapter 13 Trustees Report of Receipts and Disbursements]
    Date Published:November 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bononi, Eric E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing-bk]
    Date Published:November 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bononi, Eric E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:November 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bononi, Eric E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:November 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bononi, Eric E. [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:November 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bononi, Eric E. [Hearing Cancelled]
    Date Published:November 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bononi, Eric E. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 Asset Individual]
    Date Published:November 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bononi, Eric E. [Notice of Terminated Trustee or Attorney]
    Date Published:November 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bononi, Eric E. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
    Date Published:November 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bononi, Eric E. [Hearing w/o Forms]
    Date Published:November 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bononi, Eric E. [Convert Case 13 to 7 First Time - Never Previously a 7]
    Date Published:November 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Loss Mitigation Final Report and Portal Account History]
    Date Published:November 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Hearing on a Judge Bohm Case Set by Attorney or Trustee]
    Date Published:November 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [none]
    Date Published:November 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Convert Case from 13 to 7 First Time - Never Previously a 7]
    Date Published:November 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Order -Non-motion related-]
    Date Published:October 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Hearing Continued]
    Date Published:April 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:February 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Extending the Period for Loss Mitigation (Local Form 43)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [BNC PDF Notice]
    Date Published:December 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Extending the Period for Loss Mitigation]
    Date Published:December 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:December 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:December 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Hearing w/o Forms]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Response]
    Date Published:November 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Conference Continued]
    Date Published:October 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Extend the Period for Loss Mitigation Local Form 42]
    Date Published:August 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Proposed Order]
    Date Published:August 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Receipt of Final Installment Payment]
    Date Published:July 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Update Plan, Amended Plan, Disclosure Statement, or Objection to Disclosure Statement Deadlines]
    Date Published:July 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing-bk]
    Date Published:March 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Ch 13 UST Form 13-FR-S -batch-]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?296132
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =