open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:13-70366-
    Party Name:Marvin L. Muir and Lura M. Muir
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:October 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Final Decree]
    Date Published:September 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Ch 13 UST Form 13-FR-S -batch-]
    Date Published:September 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:August 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Approving Report of Receipts and Disbursements]
    Date Published:August 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Receipt of Funds for Registry Account]
    Date Published:August 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Chapter 13 Trustees Report of Receipts and Disbursements]
    Date Published:August 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Certification of Discharge Eligibility - Ch 13]
    Date Published:July 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:July 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Response to Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment]
    Date Published:June 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Hearing Set on Trustee Application]
    Date Published:June 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Motion for Approval of Report of Receipts and Disbursements - Plan Completed]
    Date Published:June 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment]
    Date Published:June 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Terminate Wage Attachment]
    Date Published:May 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Chapter 13 Trustees Interim Notice of Cure of Arrears]
    Date Published:April 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice of Claims Filed And Intention to Pay Claims -batch-]
    Date Published:February 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [none]
    Date Published:July 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Transfer of Claim]
    Date Published:July 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Conference Held]
    Date Published:March 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan and Setting Deadlines]
    Date Published:March 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:February 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Certificate of Service - PAWB Form 7]
    Date Published:February 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Attach Wages]
    Date Published:February 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Hearing on Amended Plan]
    Date Published:February 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan - PAWB Form 10]
    Date Published:January 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Declaration Re: Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:December 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing-bk]
    Date Published:December 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Corrective Entry]
    Date Published:December 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:December 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Attach Wages - PAWB Form 11]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?316109
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =