open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:13-70414-
    Party Name:Milton A. Figueroa
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Ch 13 UST Form 13-FR-S -batch-]
    Date Published:February 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:February 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account -batch-]
    Date Published:February 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Dismissing Case or Debtor]
    Date Published:January 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:December 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Declaration Re: Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:December 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:December 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing-bk]
    Date Published:October 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Directing Debtors To File a Notarized Affidavit Or a Ntc of Prop Mod Cnf Pln and Amd Pln]
    Date Published:October 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Certificate of Default Dismissal -batch-]
    Date Published:October 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan - PAWB Form 10]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?316403
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =