open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:14-24538-
    Party Name:Red Belt Rent-A-Space, Inc.
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bononi, Eric E. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:November 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bononi, Eric E. [Final Decree]
    Date Published:November 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bononi, Eric E. [Ch 7 UST Form 101-7-TDR: Chapter 7 Trustees Final Account and Application to be Discharged]
    Date Published:November 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bononi, Eric E. [Proof of Transmittal of Zero Balance Statement]
    Date Published:October 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bononi, Eric E. [Withdraw/Dismiss Document]
    Date Published:August 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bononi, Eric E. [Withdraw/Dismiss Document -bk-]
    Date Published:August 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bononi, Eric E. [Corrective Entry]
    Date Published:August 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bononi, Eric E. [Ch 7 UST Form 101-7-NFR: Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Application for Compensation]
    Date Published:August 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bononi, Eric E. [Ch 7 UST 101-7-TFR: Ch 7 Trustees Final Report, App Compensation, Statement of Review]
    Date Published:August 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bononi, Eric E. [Compensation]
    Date Published:August 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bononi, Eric E. [Hearing w/o Forms]
    Date Published:July 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bononi, Eric E. [Dismiss Case for Abuse]
    Date Published:July 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bononi, Eric E. [Hearing on a Judge Taddonio Case Set by Attorney or Trustee]
    Date Published:July 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bononi, Eric E. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset Business/Corporation]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?328115
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =