open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:13-22940-
    Party Name:Donna K Spohn
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:September 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Ch 13 UST Form 13-FR-S -batch-]
    Date Published:September 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Chapter 13 Trustees Report of Receipts and Disbursements]
    Date Published:May 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Dismissing Case or Debtor]
    Date Published:March 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing-bk]
    Date Published:January 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Directing Debtors To File a Notarized Affidavit Or a Ntc of Prop Mod Cnf Pln and Amd Pln]
    Date Published:January 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Certificate of Default Dismissal -batch-]
    Date Published:December 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Order -Non-motion related-]
    Date Published:September 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Chapter 13 Trustees Notice of Funds on Reserve]
    Date Published:July 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan - PAWB Form 10]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?317418
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =