open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:14-cv-05447
    Party Name:PETROSKI et al v. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
    Date Published:June 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:June 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:June 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?495945
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =