open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:06-cv-04679
    Party Name:ex rel. FOX, et al., v. HOME CARE HOSPICE, INC., et al.,
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Motion]
    Date Published:April 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
    Date Published:September 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:May 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:April 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment - Consent]
    Date Published:July 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Contempt]
    Date Published:February 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Evidentiary Hearing]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement]
    Date Published:October 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:October 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Enforce]
    Date Published:September 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:July 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
    Date Published:June 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript - PDF]
    Date Published:June 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:May 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
    Date Published:May 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw]
    Date Published:May 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:May 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:December 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement Conference]
    Date Published:December 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Enforce]
    Date Published:December 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement]
    Date Published:November 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Conference]
    Date Published:October 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:October 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:September 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:July 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?228980
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =