open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:01-cr-00137-5
    Party Name:USA v. KELLER, et al
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Praecipe to Satisfy Judgment]
    Date Published:May 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of US Passport]
    Date Published:April 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Petition for Supervised Release Action]
    Date Published:November 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Order of Probation]
    Date Published:June 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:June 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript - No PDF]
    Date Published:May 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:March 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:March 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:March 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment of Forfeiture]
    Date Published:March 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:March 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Document]
    Date Published:March 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:March 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:January 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Document]
    Date Published:October 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:October 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:August 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:August 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:August 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered]
    Date Published:August 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:August 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:August 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:August 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond]
    Date Published:August 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:August 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:August 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Praecipe/Request]
    Date Published:July 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Petition for Warrant or Summons]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:January 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?223279
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =