open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:14-cv-05336
    Party Name:SIGUENZA et al v. BAYVIEW ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case - 41(b)]
    Date Published:January 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:December 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report Of]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:August 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Approval]
    Date Published:July 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Approval]
    Date Published:July 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum and/or Opinion]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?495796
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =