open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:14-cv-01706
    Party Name:NEWSPRING MEZZANINE CAPITAL II, L.P. v. HAYES et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript - No PDF]
    Date Published:March 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case - 41(b)]
    Date Published:March 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Trial - Held]
    Date Published:March 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Trial - Begun]
    Date Published:March 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Exhibit List]
    Date Published:March 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:March 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum]
    Date Published:March 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:March 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion in Limine]
    Date Published:February 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Jury Instructions]
    Date Published:February 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Points for Charge]
    Date Published:February 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark]
    Date Published:February 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference - Final]
    Date Published:February 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Voir Dire]
    Date Published:February 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Trial Brief]
    Date Published:February 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Memorandum]
    Date Published:February 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Limine]
    Date Published:February 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:February 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:January 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum and/or Opinion Order]
    Date Published:December 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum and/or Opinion]
    Date Published:December 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:December 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:December 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Exparte Docket Entry AND Document - to be used ONLY in conjunction with other selection]
    Date Published:October 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [MDL-875 Summary Judgment (COURT ONLY)]
    Date Published:October 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Partial Judgment]
    Date Published:October 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:October 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit]
    Date Published:September 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:August 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:July 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Modify]
    Date Published:June 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Modify]
    Date Published:June 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Application/Petition]
    Date Published:June 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Praecipe/Request]
    Date Published:May 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:February 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Quash]
    Date Published:January 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Produce]
    Date Published:January 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
    Date Published:January 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:January 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:January 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:December 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Quash]
    Date Published:December 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sanctions]
    Date Published:December 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Produce]
    Date Published:December 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Counterclaim]
    Date Published:December 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Discovery]
    Date Published:December 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
    Date Published:December 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Discovery]
    Date Published:December 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket Call]
    Date Published:November 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
    Date Published:November 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:November 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:November 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:October 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Counterclaim]
    Date Published:October 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:October 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:October 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:July 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Compel]
    Date Published:June 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?489089
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =