open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:5:19-cv-03306
    Party Name:MALIBU MEDIA, LLC v. DOE
  • Filing Type:Civil [Praecipe/Request]
    Date Published:January 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Expedite]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Judgment Index - Add Record]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Quash]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:May 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:May 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:April 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Returned Mail]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure]
    Date Published:December 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:December 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Conference]
    Date Published:December 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
    Date Published:November 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
    Date Published:November 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:November 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference - Interim]
    Date Published:November 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:November 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
    Date Published:October 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:October 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:October 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:October 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:September 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:September 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:September 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:September 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Counterclaim]
    Date Published:September 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Motion]
    Date Published:August 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum and/or Opinion Order]
    Date Published:July 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum and/or Opinion]
    Date Published:July 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:June 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Quash]
    Date Published:June 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw]
    Date Published:May 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
    Date Published:April 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:April 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:April 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:April 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Suspense Order]
    Date Published:March 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Service]
    Date Published:February 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service]
    Date Published:February 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Satisfaction of Judgment]
    Date Published:August 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket Call]
    Date Published:May 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:March 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:March 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Default]
    Date Published:February 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report Of]
    Date Published:February 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:February 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Cancelling Deadline]
    Date Published:February 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:January 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:December 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment - Default]
    Date Published:December 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:December 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case - 41(b)]
    Date Published:December 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Default Judgment]
    Date Published:December 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Default Entered]
    Date Published:December 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Entry of Default]
    Date Published:December 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for Default]
    Date Published:December 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Setting Answer Deadline]
    Date Published:November 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:November 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:November 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:November 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:November 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Seal]
    Date Published:November 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Seal]
    Date Published:November 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:October 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:October 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:October 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
    Date Published:October 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Expedite]
    Date Published:October 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:September 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:September 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:August 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Hearing]
    Date Published:July 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Document Filed]
    Date Published:July 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:July 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum]
    Date Published:June 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:June 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 (COURT ONLY)]
    Date Published:June 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:June 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:June 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Copy of Copyright Form]
    Date Published:June 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket Annotation]
    Date Published:June 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions)]
    Date Published:June 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Application/Petition]
    Date Published:June 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Re: Case Assignment and Procedures]
    Date Published:June 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:June 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:June 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Hearing]
    Date Published:June 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:May 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Demand]
    Date Published:May 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement Form 7.1]
    Date Published:April 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:January 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:January 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:January 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:January 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Decision - Copy of Copyright Form]
    Date Published:December 31, 2014
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:December 16, 2014
  • Filing Type:Civil [Show Cause]
    Date Published:December 11, 2014
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit of Service]
    Date Published:December 03, 2014
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
    Date Published:December 01, 2014
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
    Date Published:December 01, 2014
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:November 19, 2014
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?477189
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =