open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:14-cv-06530
    Party Name:METRO AUTO SALES, INC. v. THE REYNOLDS AND REYNOLDS COMPANY
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum and/or Opinion]
    Date Published:July 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum and/or Opinion Order]
    Date Published:July 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:July 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement Conference]
    Date Published:June 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:June 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:June 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?497933
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =