open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:11-cv-30882
    Party Name:PERRY v. A-C PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Conditional Remand Order]
    Date Published:November 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark]
    Date Published:November 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
    Date Published:April 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:April 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:February 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:November 20, 2014
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?412257
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =