open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:11-cv-32145
    Party Name:LECOMPTE et al v. A-C PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:October 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Asbestos Rule to Show Cause Order]
    Date Published:August 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:May 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Praecipe/Request]
    Date Published:November 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:November 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?410928
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =