open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:14-cv-04467
    Party Name:WHITE v. MAHALLY et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:February 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Order]
    Date Published:May 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Notice of Docketing ROA]
    Date Published:July 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?494097
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =