open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:14-cv-05623
    Party Name:HAYNES v. KERESTES et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Order]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Notice of Docketing ROA]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:February 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum and/or Opinion Order]
    Date Published:June 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum and/or Opinion]
    Date Published:June 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Document (NOT Motion or Complaint)]
    Date Published:October 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:August 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re: Report and Recommendation]
    Date Published:July 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Application/Petition]
    Date Published:July 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:July 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:June 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?496339
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =