open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:16-cv-05065
    Party Name:HILL v. COLVIN
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Remand]
    Date Published:February 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remand]
    Date Published:February 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief and Statement]
    Date Published:January 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:December 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security Record]
    Date Published:December 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit of Service]
    Date Published:November 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Suspense Order]
    Date Published:October 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney]
    Date Published:September 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:September 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Procedural Order]
    Date Published:September 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued as to USA]
    Date Published:September 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:September 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:September 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:September 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
    Date Published:February 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Response/Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:January 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Response]
    Date Published:January 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Attorney Fees]
    Date Published:January 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:September 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:September 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Application/Petition]
    Date Published:December 02, 2014
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?217543
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =