open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:1:14-cv-00203
    Party Name:GRAY v. CLINE et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:January 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:November 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
    Date Published:November 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
    Date Published:November 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Take Deposition]
    Date Published:October 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Take Deposition]
    Date Published:October 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:October 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)]
    Date Published:October 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?217859
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =