open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:12-cv-01332
    Party Name:JAE v. STICKMAN et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:November 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:November 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:July 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Hearing]
    Date Published:July 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Hearing]
    Date Published:July 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
    Date Published:May 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extend Time]
    Date Published:May 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Stay]
    Date Published:February 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay]
    Date Published:February 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Contempt]
    Date Published:February 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:February 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)]
    Date Published:February 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Contempt]
    Date Published:February 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:January 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Response/Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:January 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Compel]
    Date Published:January 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Reopen Case]
    Date Published:December 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reopen Case]
    Date Published:December 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:December 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?205757
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =