open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:14-cv-01119
    Party Name:MILLER et al v. J.C. PENNEY CORPORATION, INC.
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:October 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
    Date Published:September 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
    Date Published:September 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
    Date Published:September 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:September 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:September 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Compel]
    Date Published:September 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:August 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Mediation]
    Date Published:August 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:July 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?218186
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =