open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:14-cr-00166-1
    Party Name:USA v. FOWLER
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Order]
    Date Published:January 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Remark]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Defender Association]
    Date Published:August 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:September 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Probation]
    Date Published:September 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Supervised Release - Hearing]
    Date Published:September 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:August 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:August 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Order of Probation]
    Date Published:August 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Praecipe to Satisfy Judgment]
    Date Published:June 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request and Order to Modify Supervision]
    Date Published:October 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Case Transferred Out - Divisional Transfer]
    Date Published:September 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Voluntary Surrender]
    Date Published:March 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:March 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:February 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Writ]
    Date Published:February 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?217381
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =