open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:18-cr-00061-1
    Party Name:USA v. DUBOIS
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:October 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:September 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:September 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:July 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:July 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Order]
    Date Published:June 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:April 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Recusal]
    Date Published:April 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:April 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:April 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:April 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:March 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:March 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:March 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:March 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Warrant]
    Date Published:March 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant ]
    Date Published:March 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?219041
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =