open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:11-cv-01157
    Party Name:UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ex rel. DIANA SALVATORE et al v. FLEMING et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:May 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
    Date Published:May 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw]
    Date Published:May 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:April 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Reopen Case]
    Date Published:April 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:March 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:March 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Response/Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:March 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order of Recusal]
    Date Published:March 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)]
    Date Published:March 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reopen Case]
    Date Published:March 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:September 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statistical Case Closing]
    Date Published:July 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:July 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:July 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:July 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:July 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set Aside Default]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?198997
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =