open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:1:14-cv-00195
    Party Name:LINDSAY v. WILSON et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
    Date Published:April 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extend Time]
    Date Published:March 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)]
    Date Published:November 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
    Date Published:November 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Prisoner Mediation]
    Date Published:October 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Response/Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:October 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:October 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Management Order]
    Date Published:September 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:September 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:September 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:September 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report and Recommendation]
    Date Published:August 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Compel]
    Date Published:August 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:July 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?217612
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =