open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:14-cv-00505
    Party Name:BLACK et al v. YOUNGUE et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:October 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Settlement]
    Date Published:July 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement]
    Date Published:June 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statistical Case Closing]
    Date Published:June 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?216068
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =