open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:13-cv-00456
    Party Name:WESTMORELAND OPPORTUNITY FUND, LLC v. ZAPPALA et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:October 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:October 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
    Date Published:October 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [File Excess Pages]
    Date Published:October 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:September 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:September 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:August 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:August 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Partial Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:August 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Vacate Document]
    Date Published:February 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Management Order]
    Date Published:February 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File]
    Date Published:January 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:January 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reopening Case]
    Date Published:December 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:December 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:December 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:December 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:November 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum Opinion & Order]
    Date Published:September 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
    Date Published:September 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Strike]
    Date Published:September 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
    Date Published:September 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?209115
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =