open-public-records

U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:12-mc-00244
    Party Name:MAXIM INTEGRATED PRODUCTS, INC., PATENT LITIGATION
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:April 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Dismiss]
    Date Published:April 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Statistical Case Closing]
    Date Published:February 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:October 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:October 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Memorandum Opinion & Order]
    Date Published:September 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:September 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Strike]
    Date Published:September 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Case Management Order]
    Date Published:August 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal]
    Date Published:July 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Leave to File Documents Under Seal]
    Date Published:June 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Order]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?204173
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =