open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:10-cr-00201-1
    Party Name:USA v. WADE
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:August 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:August 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum Opinion]
    Date Published:April 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Modify]
    Date Published:April 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Modify]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:March 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:March 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Cancelling Deadline ]
    Date Published:March 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:January 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Dismiss]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Order]
    Date Published:October 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Suppress]
    Date Published:October 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
    Date Published:September 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Suppress]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Remark]
    Date Published:April 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Writ]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Probation]
    Date Published:February 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Diversion Agreement]
    Date Published:October 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Set Off Calendar]
    Date Published:October 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set Off Calendar]
    Date Published:October 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amended Judgment]
    Date Published:September 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
    Date Published:September 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:September 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:September 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:August 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set Response]
    Date Published:June 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unseal Document]
    Date Published:June 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:February 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Tentative Findings]
    Date Published:February 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:February 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:February 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal]
    Date Published:December 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:December 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:December 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:November 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:November 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Postpone and/or Reschedule]
    Date Published:November 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Recusal]
    Date Published:November 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Postpone and/or Reschedule]
    Date Published:November 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Appointment]
    Date Published:November 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:November 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Order]
    Date Published:October 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:October 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
    Date Published:October 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:August 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Order]
    Date Published:August 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:August 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal]
    Date Published:July 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Leave to File Documents Under Seal]
    Date Published:July 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:July 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:July 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:July 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:July 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:April 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:March 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:January 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:January 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:January 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:September 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Order of Probation]
    Date Published:August 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Supervised Release - Hearing]
    Date Published:August 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:August 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:August 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond Revocation Hearing]
    Date Published:August 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:August 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:August 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:August 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
    Date Published:August 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Leave to File]
    Date Published:August 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue Seal (file at 2:13-mc-69)]
    Date Published:May 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 2]
    Date Published:May 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief 2 (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)]
    Date Published:May 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request and Order to Modify Supervision]
    Date Published:April 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Entry of Judgment of Forfeiture]
    Date Published:October 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Judgment of Forfeiture]
    Date Published:October 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:August 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
    Date Published:August 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:August 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:August 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Response/Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:July 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)]
    Date Published:July 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:July 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:April 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:December 04, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?193691
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =