open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:14-cr-00039-1
    Party Name:USA v. SABOT
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Release/Reduced Sentence pursuant to CARES and/or First Step Act]
    Date Published:August 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:July 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal]
    Date Published:June 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Leave to File Documents Under Seal]
    Date Published:June 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:April 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:March 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Order]
    Date Published:March 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:March 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:February 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:February 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:August 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:June 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?214918
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =