open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:14-cv-00437
    Party Name:BLAKENEY et al v. FAROS PITTSBURGH, LLC
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:August 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:August 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statistical Case Closing]
    Date Published:May 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
    Date Published:May 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:April 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
    Date Published:March 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:March 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:December 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
    Date Published:May 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File]
    Date Published:May 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:March 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Management Order]
    Date Published:March 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:February 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:January 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:January 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Vacate]
    Date Published:January 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:January 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:January 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Response/Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:December 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Vacate]
    Date Published:December 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:November 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:November 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:November 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Compel]
    Date Published:November 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:November 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
    Date Published:September 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
    Date Published:September 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:September 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:September 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:September 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:August 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
    Date Published:July 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?215856
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =