open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:18-cr-00199-1
    Party Name:USA v. CARR et al
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
    Date Published:September 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Clarification]
    Date Published:August 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Clarification]
    Date Published:July 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [MAG Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:June 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [MAG Order Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:June 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Petition for Supervised Release Action]
    Date Published:June 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Release/Reduced Sentence Pursuant to CARES and/or First Step Act]
    Date Published:June 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Release/Reduced Sentence pursuant to CARES and/or First Step Act]
    Date Published:April 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Entry of Judgment of Forfeiture]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Judgment of Forfeiture]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:September 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Order]
    Date Published:August 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
    Date Published:August 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Seal Case]
    Date Published:August 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment - 3582c2]
    Date Published:June 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:June 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:June 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:June 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:April 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:March 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal]
    Date Published:March 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal]
    Date Published:March 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:March 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:February 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:February 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant ]
    Date Published:February 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Warrant]
    Date Published:February 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Petition for Action on Conditions of Ptrl Release]
    Date Published:February 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Order]
    Date Published:January 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:January 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:January 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:October 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Revoking Bond]
    Date Published:October 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Request for Modifying the Conditions of Supervision]
    Date Published:June 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
    Date Published:May 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:May 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
    Date Published:April 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment (Credit Card Payment)]
    Date Published:April 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:April 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:April 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:April 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
    Date Published:April 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unseal Document]
    Date Published:April 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Document]
    Date Published:March 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:February 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:November 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
    Date Published:September 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue Sentence]
    Date Published:September 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Seal Document]
    Date Published:September 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue Sentence]
    Date Published:September 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
    Date Published:August 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript - PDF]
    Date Published:August 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum and/or Opinion Order]
    Date Published:August 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum and/or Opinion]
    Date Published:August 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript - No PDF]
    Date Published:June 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Acquittal ]
    Date Published:May 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [New Trial ]
    Date Published:May 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Abstract of Order for Presentence Investigation]
    Date Published:May 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Verdict]
    Date Published:May 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Trial]
    Date Published:May 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
    Date Published:May 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Presence of Court Reporter]
    Date Published:May 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Voir Dire]
    Date Published:May 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Remark]
    Date Published:May 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response]
    Date Published:May 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:April 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Seal]
    Date Published:April 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Dismiss]
    Date Published:April 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
    Date Published:April 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Trial Brief]
    Date Published:April 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Verdict Sheet]
    Date Published:April 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Voir Dire]
    Date Published:April 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Jury Instructions]
    Date Published:April 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Seal]
    Date Published:April 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Protective Order]
    Date Published:April 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:April 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:April 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:April 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:April 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Writ]
    Date Published:April 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Modify]
    Date Published:February 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Modify]
    Date Published:February 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Hearing]
    Date Published:January 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:January 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:January 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Appointment]
    Date Published:January 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Tentative Findings]
    Date Published:January 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Hearing]
    Date Published:January 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:January 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Vacate (2255) - Court Users]
    Date Published:January 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Travel]
    Date Published:January 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Travel]
    Date Published:January 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:December 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Discovery]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion in Limine]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum Opinion]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment Unsealed]
    Date Published:November 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment 3582c2]
    Date Published:October 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:September 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)]
    Date Published:September 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Discovery]
    Date Published:September 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [In Limine]
    Date Published:September 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
    Date Published:August 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Postpone and/or Reschedule]
    Date Published:June 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Postpone and/or Reschedule]
    Date Published:June 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:June 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:June 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment (PROBATION REVOCATION or SUPERVISED RELEASE JUDGMENT)]
    Date Published:March 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
    Date Published:March 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:November 20, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?211131
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =