open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:11-20567-ref
    Party Name:Thomas R. Shirk
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:August 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:August 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:August 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Close Case]
    Date Published:August 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing -Notice of Objection to Discharge]
    Date Published:June 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Notice of Objection to Discharge]
    Date Published:June 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report Closed Completed]
    Date Published:June 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Response to Notice of Final Cure Payment Rule 3002.1]
    Date Published:May 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment]
    Date Published:May 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Document]
    Date Published:March 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:February 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Hearing Continued]
    Date Published:January 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Response]
    Date Published:December 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
    Date Published:December 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Notice of Motion]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?401716
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =