open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:14-19033-jkf
    Party Name:Vincent A Shaw and Vincent A. Shaw
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DERSHAW, TERRY P. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:February 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DERSHAW, TERRY P. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds]
    Date Published:February 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DERSHAW, TERRY P. [Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:February 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DERSHAW, TERRY P. [Hearing Held (Other)]
    Date Published:February 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DERSHAW, TERRY P. [Show Cause]
    Date Published:January 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DERSHAW, TERRY P. [Notice of Deficiency]
    Date Published:January 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DERSHAW, TERRY P. [Meeting of Creditors Not Held (Chapter 7 Only)]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DERSHAW, TERRY P. [Meeting of Creditors Continued (multi)]
    Date Published:December 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DERSHAW, TERRY P. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:November 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DERSHAW, TERRY P. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:November 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DERSHAW, TERRY P. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Clerk's Notice Re: Presumption of Abuse]
    Date Published:November 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DERSHAW, TERRY P. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:November 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DERSHAW, TERRY P. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
    Date Published:November 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Clerk's Notice Re: Presumption of Abuse]
    Date Published:November 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Convert Case to 7]
    Date Published:November 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:November 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
    Date Published:October 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Scheduling Hearing]
    Date Published:October 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Convert Case to 7]
    Date Published:October 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Hearing Continued]
    Date Published:September 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
    Date Published:August 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:August 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:August 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:August 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Certificate of No Response]
    Date Published:August 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:July 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Notice of Motion]
    Date Published:July 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:July 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Relief from Co-Debtor Stay]
    Date Published:July 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:July 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Hearing Held (Other)]
    Date Published:September 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:September 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Hearing Continued (Other)]
    Date Published:June 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?447653
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =