open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:14-16934-ref
    Party Name:William Charles Stotsenburgh, III and Sherry Eileen Stotsenburgh
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KALINER, MICHAEL H [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:November 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KALINER, MICHAEL H [Close Case]
    Date Published:November 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KALINER, MICHAEL H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:August 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KALINER, MICHAEL H [Avoid Lien]
    Date Published:August 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KALINER, MICHAEL H [Certificate of No Response]
    Date Published:August 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KALINER, MICHAEL H [Notice of Motion]
    Date Published:August 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KALINER, MICHAEL H [Reopen Case ]
    Date Published:August 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KALINER, MICHAEL H [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:August 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KALINER, MICHAEL H. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?445288
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =