open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:18-13716-amc
    Party Name:Pauline A. Hinton
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, (Chapter 13) SCOTT F. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Annual Report]
    Date Published:August 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, (Chapter 13) SCOTT F. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:January 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, (Chapter 13) SCOTT F. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, (Chapter 13) SCOTT F. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:August 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, (Chapter 13) SCOTT F. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, (Chapter 13) SCOTT F. [Certificate of No Response]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, (Chapter 13) SCOTT F. [Compensation]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Confirming Chap. 13 Plan]
    Date Published:February 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Vacating Dismissal Order]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Proposed Order]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Appeal Returned]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Amended Chapter 13 Plan(pre-confirmation)]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:January 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Hearing Continued]
    Date Published:January 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Change Trustee]
    Date Published:January 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [District Court re: Appeal]
    Date Published:January 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Response]
    Date Published:January 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [Document]
    Date Published:December 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [Transmission of Record on Appeal]
    Date Published:December 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
    Date Published:November 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [Transmission]
    Date Published:November 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [Attach PDF Document]
    Date Published:November 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [Hearing Held (Other)]
    Date Published:November 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [Reconsider]
    Date Published:November 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:November 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case for Other]
    Date Published:November 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [Brief]
    Date Published:November 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [Schedule J - (for first filing and amendments)]
    Date Published:November 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [Schedule I - (for first filing and amendments)]
    Date Published:November 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
    Date Published:November 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [Order on Generic Motion ]
    Date Published:October 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [Dismiss Case for Other]
    Date Published:September 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [Notice of Inaccurate Filing (bk)]
    Date Published:September 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [Notice of Objection to claim]
    Date Published:September 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [Objection to Claim]
    Date Published:September 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [Hearing Continued]
    Date Published:August 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:August 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [Response]
    Date Published:August 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:August 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [Extend Automatic Stay]
    Date Published:August 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [Hearing Continued (Other)]
    Date Published:August 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [Installment Payment via Credit Card]
    Date Published:August 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [Praecipe to Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:August 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:August 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [Generic Motion ]
    Date Published:August 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [Generic Application]
    Date Published:August 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:August 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [Notice of Motion]
    Date Published:August 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:August 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [Meeting of Creditors Continued (multi)]
    Date Published:July 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [Transfer case from Trustee Frederick L. Reigle to Trustee William C. Miller]
    Date Published:July 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Second)]
    Date Published:July 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Scheduling Hearing]
    Date Published:June 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Expedite Hearing]
    Date Published:June 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Extend Automatic Stay]
    Date Published:June 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:June 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:June 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:June 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Add Trustee]
    Date Published:June 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
    Date Published:June 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Matrix]
    Date Published:June 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:June 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:June 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Statement of Social Security Number (Form 121)]
    Date Published:June 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Social Security Number (Form 121)]
    Date Published:June 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:June 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:June 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:June 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:June 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:June 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:June 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:June 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Tax Documents]
    Date Published:December 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:December 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
    Date Published:December 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:September 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Hearing Held (Other)]
    Date Published:September 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case for Other]
    Date Published:September 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:July 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing- Transfer of Claim]
    Date Published:December 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:November 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Transfer of Claim]
    Date Published:November 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:April 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:April 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan(pre-confirmation)]
    Date Published:March 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:January 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Hearing Continued (Other)]
    Date Published:October 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:August 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Hearing Continued]
    Date Published:July 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Praecipe to Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:July 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Objection to Claim]
    Date Published:June 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Notice of Objection to claim]
    Date Published:June 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Response]
    Date Published:June 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Vacate]
    Date Published:June 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Notice of Motion]
    Date Published:June 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?442755
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =