open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:14-18267-sr
    Party Name:Maxroy C. Williams
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
    Date Published:September 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:September 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
    Date Published:July 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Notice of Motion]
    Date Published:July 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:July 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Amended Document]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?446802
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =