open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:14-19115-ref
    Party Name:Darryl Boyd Leatherbury and Antoinette Dorothea Leatherbury
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:June 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
    Date Published:June 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:April 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Certificate of No Response]
    Date Published:March 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case for Other]
    Date Published:March 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Dismiss Case for Other]
    Date Published:March 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Compensation]
    Date Published:March 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:October 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Hearing Continued]
    Date Published:October 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Hearing Continued (Other)]
    Date Published:October 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Withdrawal & Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:October 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan(pre-confirmation)]
    Date Published:August 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?447739
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =