open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:14-19020-mdc
    Party Name:Morgan D. Miller, Jr.
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:June 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Close Case]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Close Case]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:April 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Automatic Order Discharging Debtor (Chapter13)]
    Date Published:April 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Domestic Support Obligation Certification]
    Date Published:March 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing -Notice of Objection to Discharge]
    Date Published:March 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:March 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Notice of Objection to Discharge / Final Report and Account]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report Closed Completed]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:February 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Discontinue Wage Deduction]
    Date Published:October 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:October 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Certification of Default]
    Date Published:September 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:August 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Motion to Approve]
    Date Published:August 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:August 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?447640
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =