open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:13-11605-elf
    Party Name:Steven W. Winthrop and Nancy G Winthrop
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:July 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Close Case]
    Date Published:July 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Close Case]
    Date Published:July 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:July 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Automatic Order Discharging Debtor (Chapter13)]
    Date Published:July 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Domestic Support Obligation Certification]
    Date Published:July 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:June 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:June 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing -Notice of Objection to Discharge]
    Date Published:May 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Notice of Objection to Discharge]
    Date Published:May 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report Closed Completed]
    Date Published:May 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:December 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing- Transfer of Claim]
    Date Published:April 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Transfer of Claim]
    Date Published:April 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (No Proof of Claim Filed)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:July 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Notice (Praecipe) of Change of Address]
    Date Published:September 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Stipulation of Settlement]
    Date Published:September 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Response]
    Date Published:July 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:July 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Notice of Motion]
    Date Published:July 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?427757
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =