open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:13-20949-ref
    Party Name:William J. Chadwick and Rebecca C.E. Chadwick
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FELDMAN, LYNN E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:February 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FELDMAN, LYNN E. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:February 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FELDMAN, LYNN E. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:February 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FELDMAN, LYNN E. [Close Case]
    Date Published:February 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FELDMAN, LYNN E. [Hearing Held (Reaffirmation Agreement)]
    Date Published:January 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FELDMAN, LYNN E. [Order on Generic Motion ]
    Date Published:December 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FELDMAN, LYNN E. [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:November 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FELDMAN, LYNN E. [Hearing Continued (Reaffirmation)]
    Date Published:November 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FELDMAN, LYNN E. [Certificate of No Response]
    Date Published:November 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FELDMAN, LYNN E. [Scheduling Hearing]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FELDMAN, LYNN E. [Generic Motion ]
    Date Published:November 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FELDMAN, LYNN E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Reaffirmation Hearing ]
    Date Published:October 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FELDMAN, LYNN E. [Reaffirmation Hearing]
    Date Published:October 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FELDMAN, LYNN E. [Hearing Continued]
    Date Published:October 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FELDMAN, LYNN E. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:October 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FELDMAN, LYNN E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:September 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FELDMAN, LYNN E. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
    Date Published:July 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FELDMAN, LYNN E. [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
    Date Published:July 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FELDMAN, LYNN E. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:July 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FELDMAN, LYNN E. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?437705
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =