open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:13-21121-amc
    Party Name:Stephenie Hanna
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Close Case]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Close Case]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:May 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Automatic Order Discharging Debtor (Chapter13)]
    Date Published:May 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing -Notice of Objection to Discharge]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Notice of Objection to Discharge / Final Report and Account]
    Date Published:April 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report Closed Completed]
    Date Published:April 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Response to Notice of Final Cure Payment Rule 3002.1]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Domestic Support Obligation Certification]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment]
    Date Published:January 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:November 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:December 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Transfer case from Judge Jean K. FitzSimon to Judge Ashely M. Chan]
    Date Published:September 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Notice (Praecipe) of Change of Address]
    Date Published:June 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:June 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Praecipe to Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:December 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Certification of Default]
    Date Published:December 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing- Transfer of Claim]
    Date Published:July 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Transfer of Claim]
    Date Published:July 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:April 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Stipulation]
    Date Published:April 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Praecipe to Re-list]
    Date Published:April 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Attach PDF Document]
    Date Published:April 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:February 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Hearing Continued]
    Date Published:December 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Reply]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Notice of Motion]
    Date Published:November 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:November 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?437887
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =