open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:5:13-bk-04653-
    Party Name:Martinell Enterprises, Inc.
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Order sent to counsel for mailing (*ECF Atty*)]
    Date Published:January 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion for Final Decree]
    Date Published:January 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Final Decree]
    Date Published:December 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:December 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Order on Application for allowance of compensation and expenses]
    Date Published:November 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Compensation & Expenses]
    Date Published:October 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Monthly Operating Report]
    Date Published:June 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Proceeding Memo (multipurpose event)]
    Date Published:June 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Status Report]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service (or Certificate of Mailing)]
    Date Published:June 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Approve Compromise or Settlement/Stipulation]
    Date Published:June 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Order sent to counsel for mailing (to parties in interest) (*ECF Atty*)]
    Date Published:June 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of No Objection]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Transfer of Claim]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?230129
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =