open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:1:14-bk-05322-
    Party Name:Joseph F Bissett and Amy R Bissett
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Final Report of Ch. 13 Trustee (batch)]
    Date Published:November 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:October 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case/Party]
    Date Published:October 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Dismiss Case/Party (Ch 13 -- 11 USC 1307)]
    Date Published:October 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Certificate of Default]
    Date Published:August 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Reassigning Case in the Interests of Judicial Economy]
    Date Published:February 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Appearance (Entry and/or Withdrawal)]
    Date Published:December 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Approving/Denying Stipulation]
    Date Published:March 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Failure to Include Revisable Order]
    Date Published:February 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Stipulation]
    Date Published:February 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
    Date Published:January 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Extend Time]
    Date Published:January 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Stipulation Due]
    Date Published:December 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Request to Remove Matter from Hearing List]
    Date Published:December 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Continue/Reschedule a Hearing or Trial]
    Date Published:November 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Request to Continue Hearing/Trial with Concurrence (LBF 9013-3)]
    Date Published:November 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change Rule 3002.1]
    Date Published:November 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Objection]
    Date Published:November 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Substitution of Attorney]
    Date Published:November 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Certificate of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:October 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Auto-docket of credit card]
    Date Published:October 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Automatic Stay (Relief from)]
    Date Published:October 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Confirmation of Plan (Approval or Denial)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Proceeding Memo (confirmation hearing held, plan eligible for confirmation) (Record Made)]
    Date Published:August 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Order on Motion to Extend, Impose or Reimpose Automatic Stay]
    Date Published:July 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Proceeding Memo (multipurpose event)]
    Date Published:July 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Certificate of No Objection]
    Date Published:July 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Certification of Execution of Rights and Responsibilities Agreement (LBF 2016-2(a))]
    Date Published:July 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Request for Payment of Ch. 13 Compensation and Expenses (LBF 2016-2(c))]
    Date Published:July 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Certification of Compliance with Order]
    Date Published:July 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Proceeding Memo (confirmation hearing called, continued)]
    Date Published:July 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Semi-passive (Automatic Stay (Motion to Extend OR Impose))]
    Date Published:June 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Automatic Stay (Extend, Impose or Reimpose)]
    Date Published:June 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Terminate Motion to Dismiss (w/ability to Cancel Hearing) PUBLIC ENTRY]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss (material default OR copy Federal tax return)]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Automatic Assignment-Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?237876
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =