open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:5:14-bk-04040-
    Party Name:Eric Lester Leinbach
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [BNC Certificate of Notice (Final Decree)]
    Date Published:September 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Final Decree (Ch. 7 indiv and business Cases)]
    Date Published:September 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Certification of Completion of Estate Administration by Trustee and Application for Discharge]
    Date Published:September 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Order on Motion to Avoid Lien]
    Date Published:May 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
    Date Published:April 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Report from Trustee re: Unclaimed Funds/Small Dividends]
    Date Published:April 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Avoid Lien]
    Date Published:April 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Approving/Denying Stipulation]
    Date Published:April 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Hearing canceled (PUBLIC ENTRY - do not use with a private event)]
    Date Published:April 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Stipulation]
    Date Published:April 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Notice of Final Report and Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:December 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Notice to Trustee (Final Report received from UST)]
    Date Published:December 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Trustees Final Report and Application for Fees]
    Date Published:December 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:November 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Exhibit]
    Date Published:October 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Continue]
    Date Published:October 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Certificate of fees and bill for collection (0.00 due)]
    Date Published:October 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Request for Court Costs]
    Date Published:October 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Continue/Reschedule a Hearing or Trial]
    Date Published:October 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Request to Continue Hearing/Trial with Concurrence (LBF 9013-3)]
    Date Published:September 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Stay]
    Date Published:September 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Answer]
    Date Published:September 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Auto-docket of credit card]
    Date Published:September 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Automatic Stay (Relief from)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Brief]
    Date Published:June 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Transcript of Testimony]
    Date Published:May 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [BNC Certificate of Notice (Notice of Hearing)]
    Date Published:April 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Hearing]
    Date Published:April 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:April 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Objection]
    Date Published:April 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Compensation & Expenses]
    Date Published:March 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Certificate of Service (or Certificate of Mailing)]
    Date Published:March 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Proceeding Memo (multipurpose event)]
    Date Published:March 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Hearing (or Conference, Preliminary Hearing, Status Conference, Pre-Trial Conference, Argument)]
    Date Published:February 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Order District Court Judge]
    Date Published:February 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Substitution of Attorney (batch)]
    Date Published:January 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Request for Notices under 2002 (batch)]
    Date Published:November 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [BNC Certificate of Notice (Discharge (Chapter 7))]
    Date Published:November 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Discharge of Debtor]
    Date Published:November 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Close/Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (public entry, sends emails, no doc # or PDF)]
    Date Published:November 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Order on Motion to Approve Compromise or Settlement/Stipulation]
    Date Published:October 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Order of the Court (docket after docketing Opinion)]
    Date Published:October 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Opinion of the Court]
    Date Published:October 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Approve Compromise or Settlement/Stipulation]
    Date Published:September 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Notice of Telephonic Court Appearance]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?236453
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =