open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:1:14-bk-05207-
    Party Name:William Jeffrey Pavone and Melissa Lynne Pavone
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [BNC Certificate of Notice (Discharge (Chapter 7))]
    Date Published:November 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [BNC Certificate of Notice (Final Decree)]
    Date Published:November 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Final Decree (Ch. 7 indiv and business Cases)]
    Date Published:November 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Discharge of Debtor]
    Date Published:November 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - no funds collected]
    Date Published:November 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:November 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay]
    Date Published:October 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Hearing canceled (PUBLIC ENTRY - do not use with a private event)]
    Date Published:October 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Certificate of Financial Management OR Certification About a Financial Management Course (Form 423)]
    Date Published:October 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Auto-docket of credit card]
    Date Published:October 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Meeting of Creditors Continued (Ch 7)]
    Date Published:October 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Appearance (Entry and/or Withdrawal)]
    Date Published:September 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Final Report of Ch. 13 Trustee (batch)]
    Date Published:September 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [BNC Certificate of Notice (Notice of Rescheduled or Reconvened 341 Meeting)]
    Date Published:September 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Meeting of Creditors (Rescheduled or Reconvened)]
    Date Published:September 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Request to Set 341 Meeting (Reconverted or Reopened Case)]
    Date Published:September 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Notice to Trustee (Reconverted or Reopened Case)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Add Trustee by US Trustee]
    Date Published:August 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: **, No Trustee Appointed Yet ** [Add Trustee by US Trustee]
    Date Published:August 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: **, No Trustee Appointed Yet ** [Auto-docket of credit card]
    Date Published:August 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: **, No Trustee Appointed Yet ** [Convert Case (do NOT use this event with a MOTION to Convert)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: **, No Trustee Appointed Yet ** [Filing Fee Due]
    Date Published:August 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: **, No Trustee Appointed Yet ** [Election to Convert from Ch. 12 or 13 to Ch. 7 (Absolute Right)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Election to Convert from Ch. 12 or 13 to Ch. 7 (Absolute Right)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:July 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Order on Motion for (or termination of) Wage Attachment]
    Date Published:July 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Wage Attachment Order (or termination of)]
    Date Published:July 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change Rule 3002.1]
    Date Published:January 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay]
    Date Published:June 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Proceeding Memo (multipurpose event)]
    Date Published:June 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Certificate of No Objection]
    Date Published:June 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Auto-docket of credit card]
    Date Published:May 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Change of Address]
    Date Published:March 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Substitution of Attorney (batch)]
    Date Published:November 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [PDF document]
    Date Published:August 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Terminate Motion to Dismiss (w/ability to Cancel Hearing) PUBLIC ENTRY]
    Date Published:July 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss (material default OR copy Federal tax return)]
    Date Published:July 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:July 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Order on Motion for (or termination of) Wage Attachment]
    Date Published:July 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Wage Attachment Order (or termination of)]
    Date Published:July 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Motion to Dismiss Ch. 13 Case by Trustee (11 USC 521 and 1307(c)) (material default OR tax returns)]
    Date Published:June 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Order on Motion to Modify Plan]
    Date Published:October 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change Rule 3002.1]
    Date Published:August 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Hearing]
    Date Published:August 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Objection to Ch. 13 Plan by Trustee]
    Date Published:August 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Approving/Denying Stipulation]
    Date Published:August 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Hearing canceled (PUBLIC ENTRY - do not use with a private event)]
    Date Published:August 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Stipulation]
    Date Published:August 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Modify Plan (Post Confirmation)]
    Date Published:July 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Answer]
    Date Published:July 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Flags Set or Removed]
    Date Published:July 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Automatic Stay (Relief from)]
    Date Published:July 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Automatic Stay (Relief from)]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?237752
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =