open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:1:13-bk-06254-
    Party Name:S3, Inc.
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [BNC Certificate of Notice (Final Decree)]
    Date Published:June 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Final Decree (Ch. 7 indiv and business Cases)]
    Date Published:May 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Certification of Completion of Estate Administration by Trustee and Application for Discharge]
    Date Published:May 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Order regarding Allowances in Trustees Final Report & Account and Application for Fees]
    Date Published:March 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Notice of Final Report and Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:February 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Notice to Trustee (Final Report received from UST)]
    Date Published:February 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Trustees Final Report and Application for Fees]
    Date Published:February 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Certificate of fees and bill for collection (0.00 due)]
    Date Published:December 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Request for Court Costs]
    Date Published:December 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Exhibit]
    Date Published:October 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Fee application cover sheet was not filed (LBR 2016-1(a))]
    Date Published:October 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Close/Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (public entry, sends emails, no doc # or PDF)]
    Date Published:August 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Notice and Certificate of Service (NOT for sale motions)]
    Date Published:June 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:March 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [PDF document]
    Date Published:March 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Complaint]
    Date Published:August 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Order on Application for allowance of compensation and expenses]
    Date Published:August 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Request for Notices under 2002]
    Date Published:July 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Compensation & Expenses]
    Date Published:July 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Certificate of Service (or Certificate of Mailing)]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?231809
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =