open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:5:14-bk-03250-
    Party Name:Robert P Davis and Velma E Davis
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [BNC Certificate of Notice (Final Decree)]
    Date Published:February 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Final Decree (Ch. 7 indiv and business Cases)]
    Date Published:February 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Certification of Completion of Estate Administration by Trustee and Application for Discharge]
    Date Published:February 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Exhibit]
    Date Published:September 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Notice of Final Report and Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:September 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Compensation & Expenses]
    Date Published:September 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Notice to Trustee (Final Report received from UST)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Trustees Final Report and Application for Fees]
    Date Published:August 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Continue]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?235611
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =